Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17806 Week
» 70822 Month
» 190349 Year
» 3217202 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5607 |
14/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31184 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
14/04/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
22/02/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
22/02/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
27/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
30/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5607 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
22/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31184 |
|
|
22/02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/02/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31184 |
|
|
07/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|