Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 282 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2189 Week
» 20971 Month
» 269264 Year
» 1153645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5607 14/04/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31184 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/04/1960
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/04/1960
Withdrawn 04/02/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 07/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 14/04/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
41A Tinsley w/e 22/04/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
FP Finsbury Park w/e 08/03/1975
TE Thornaby 05/06/1988
   Withdrawn 04/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
02/1974   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
27/12/1963 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
30/12/1963 Not severe   Not known Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/04/1960 To Service To service as D5607
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
22/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31184    
02/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
05/06/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
04/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31184    
07/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev