Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5611 28/04/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31188 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/228/04/1960
31/105/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 28/04/1960
Withdrawn 24/01/1999
Time in Service 38 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 09/2008
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 28/04/1960
   Withdrawn 24/01/1999

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1960 To Service To service as D5611
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
05/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
29/06/1969 Sightings At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31188    
24/01/1999 Withdrawn Condemned as 31188    
09/2008 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev