Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 526 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2433 Week
» 21215 Month
» 269508 Year
» 1153889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5612 05/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31189 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/205/05/1960
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/05/1960
Withdrawn 26/05/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs , 21 dys
Cut Up 01/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 05/05/1960
D15 Leicester Division w/e 20/02/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 27/03/1965
   Withdrawn 26/05/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1976   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/05/1960 To Service To service as D5612
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
20/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
29/06/1969 Sightings At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31189    
12/1976 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
26/05/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31189    
01/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev