Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 146 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4658 Week
» 27164 Month
» 330354 Year
» 1551919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5613 05/05/1960  
TOPS (31/1) 31190 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/205/05/1960
31/101/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 05/05/1960 to Finsbury Park (34G)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) on 05/05/1960

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
13/07/1968   Dual Braked        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
11/02/1964 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
03/03/1964 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/05/1960 To Service To service as D5613
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
13/07/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31190    

prev prev