Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 382 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1767 Week
» 8572 Month
» 115518 Year
» 1337083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5614 m/e 02/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal During 08/1963
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 38 yrs , 6 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRY Barry 4w/e 05/11/1949
85A Worcester 4w/e 07/10/1961
88E Abercynon 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   5w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as GWR Number 5614
Built at Swindon Works
   
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5614    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev