Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 525 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18328 Week
» 71344 Month
» 190871 Year
» 3217724 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5615 |
12/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31192 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
12/05/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
34G |
|
Finsbury Park (New) |
on |
12/05/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/10/1982 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
18/09/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/09/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/03/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
28/09/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5615 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
18/09/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31192 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
10/10/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31192 |
|
|
01/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|