Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 215 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7675 Week
» 5188 Month
» 233072 Year
» 1454637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5616 19/05/1960  
TOPS (31/4) 31406 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/05/1960
31/111/12/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 19/05/1960
Withdrawn 04/01/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 12/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 19/05/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
41A Tinsley w/e 18/12/1965
32B Ipswich w/e 10/12/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 15/04/1967
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
34G Finsbury Park w/e 07/02/1970
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
34G Finsbury Park 2w/e 01/01/1972
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 04/01/1991

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 3w/e 01/01/1966
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 7w/e 07/01/1967
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 29/04/1967
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 25/10/1969
ALLOC 34G Finsbury Park 5w/e 07/02/1970

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
12/1971   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/05/1960 To Service To service as D5616
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31406    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
04/01/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31406    
12/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev