Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 152 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 152 Week
» 18934 Month
» 267227 Year
» 1151608 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5617 19/05/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31193 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/05/1960
31/105/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/05/1960
Withdrawn 01/05/1995
Time in Service 34 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 11/2006
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 19/05/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
31B March w/e 08/10/1966
40B Immingham w/e 07/01/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/05/1970
40B Immingham w/e 06/06/1970
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/07/1972
81A Old Oak Common w/e 11/11/1972
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 24/03/1973
OC Old Oak Common w/e 12/05/1973
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 07/07/1973
   Withdrawn 01/05/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
04/1976   Dual AWS Removed  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
15/07/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/05/1960 To Service To service as D5617
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
06/06/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/07/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31193    
24/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
12/05/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
07/07/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
04/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
01/05/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31193    
11/2006 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev