Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 192 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 192 Week
» 18974 Month
» 267267 Year
» 1151648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5621 02/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31197 01/01/1973
TOPS (31/4) 31423 01/1975

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/202/06/1960
31/103/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/06/1960
Withdrawn 01/09/1996
Time in Service 36 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys
Cut Up 09/2009
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 02/06/1960
TI Tinsley w/e 11/05/1974
CW Cricklewood East w/e 19/10/1974
91M To London Midland Region w/e 26/10/1974
FP Finsbury Park 3w/e 02/05/1976
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/09/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
01/1975   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/06/1960 To Service To service as D5621
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
03/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31197    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
19/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
26/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
01/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 31423    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/09/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31423    
09/2009 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev