Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 198 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2537 Week
» 8671 Month
» 236555 Year
» 1458120 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5622 09/06/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 31198 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/209/06/1960
31/103/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 09/06/1960
Withdrawn 16/03/1990
Time in Service 29 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 09/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 09/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 27/08/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 22/07/1961
30A Stratford w/e 16/09/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 18/08/1962
31B March w/e 15/09/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 24/08/1968
34G Finsbury Park w/e 22/02/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 11/10/1969
40B Immingham w/e 10/01/1970
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/05/1970
   Withdrawn 16/03/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
03/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31      
08/1968   Dual Braked      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1960 To Service To service as D5622
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
03/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
24/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/02/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
10/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31198    
16/03/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31198    
09/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev