Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5623 09/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31199 08/11/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/209/06/1960
31/111/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 223
Cost when Built £
To Service 09/06/1960
Withdrawn 05/05/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 12/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 09/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 27/08/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 18/08/1962
31B March w/e 15/09/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
   Withdrawn 05/05/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/06/1960 To Service To service as D5623
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 223
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
08/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31199    
05/05/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31199    
12/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev