Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 98 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4567 Week
» 5457 Month
» 313438 Year
» 1197819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5624 16/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31200 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/216/06/1960
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 224
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/06/1960
Withdrawn 30/06/2007
Time in Service 47 yrs , 14 dys
Cut Up 06/2007
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 16/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 30/06/2007

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
29/05/1961 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
18/10/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1960 To Service To service as D5624
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 224
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31200    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
06/2007 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    
30/06/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 31200    

prev prev