Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 1265 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24896 Week
» 89850 Month
» 292514 Year
» 3319367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5624 |
16/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31200 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
16/06/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
29/05/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
18/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5624 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 224 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31200 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31200 |
|
|