Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1422 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15465 Week
» 80419 Month
» 283083 Year
» 3309936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5626 |
23/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31202 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
23/06/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
22/07/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
22/07/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
22/10/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5626 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 226 Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
22/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31202 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
28/10/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31202 |
|
|
11/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Cricklewood MPD |
|
|