Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5627 23/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31203 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/223/06/1960
31/107/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 227
Cost when Built £
To Service 23/06/1960
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 23/06/1960
30A Stratford w/e 26/11/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 17/05/1969
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/05/1970

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
04/1969   Dual Braked  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/06/1960 To Service To service as D5627
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 227
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
04/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31203    

prev prev