Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1936 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15342 Week
» 68358 Month
» 187885 Year
» 3214738 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5627 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
228 |
To Service |
During 08/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/04/1963 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
04/05/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5627 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
28/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
11/04/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5627 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|