Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5628 30/06/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31204 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/230/06/1960
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 228
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/06/1960
Withdrawn 01/03/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 8 mths , -1 dys
Cut Up 03/1988
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 30/06/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/05/1970
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
   Withdrawn 01/03/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1960 To Service To service as D5628
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 228
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31204    
01/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 31204    
03/1988 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev