Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3501 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16907 Week
» 69923 Month
» 189450 Year
» 3216303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5629 |
30/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31205 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
30/06/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
13/07/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1975 |
|
Modified headcode box |
|
|
|
|
23/10/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
23/10/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5629 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 229 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
13/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31205 |
|
|
10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box |
|
|
23/10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
18/02/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31205 |
|
|
07/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|