Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5632 14/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31208 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/07/1960
31/106/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 232
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/07/1960
Withdrawn 13/03/1990
Time in Service 29 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 12/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 14/07/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
30A Stratford w/e 05/06/1965
31B March w/e 14/03/1970
   Withdrawn 13/03/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1973   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/07/1960 To Service To service as D5632
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 232
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31208    
10/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
13/03/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31208    
12/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev