Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5633 14/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31209 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/07/1960
31/111/12/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 233
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/07/1960
Withdrawn 15/05/2003
Time in Service 42 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 05/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 14/07/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 08/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 15/01/1966
41C Wath w/e 18/03/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
FP Finsbury Park w/e 02/06/1973
91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 02/05/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn 15/05/2003

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1975   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/07/1960 To Service To service as D5633
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 233
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
18/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31209    
02/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
04/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
05/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    
15/05/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 31209    

prev prev