Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 190 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 190 Week
» 18972 Month
» 267265 Year
» 1151646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5634 21/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31210 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/221/07/1960
31/104/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 234
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/07/1960
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/07/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
FP Finsbury Park w/e 02/06/1973
91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 02/05/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/05/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1974   Dual Braked  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1960 To Service To service as D5634
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 234
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31210    
02/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
12/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    

prev prev