Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5635 21/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31211 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/221/07/1960
31/104/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 235
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/07/1960
Withdrawn 01/01/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 12/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/07/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
IM Immingham w/e 23/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/01/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1960 To Service To service as D5635
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 235
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31211    
23/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
01/01/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31211    
12/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev