Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 714 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1661 Week
» 20443 Month
» 268736 Year
» 1153117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5636 28/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31212 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/228/07/1960
31/118/11/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 236
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/07/1960
Withdrawn 16/12/1991
Time in Service 31 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 05/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 28/07/1960
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
SF Stratford w/e 12/01/1974
MR March 2w/e 12/10/1974
SF Stratford w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 16/12/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
18/11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
06/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/07/1960 To Service To service as D5636
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 236
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
06/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31212    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
16/12/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31212    
05/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev