Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 844 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18647 Week
» 71663 Month
» 191190 Year
» 3218043 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5636 |
28/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31212 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
28/07/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
06/06/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
03/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
11/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
06/06/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
03/1978 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
fX |
|
11/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
fX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5636 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 236 Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31212 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
16/12/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31212 |
|
|
05/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|