Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5637 28/07/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31213 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/228/07/1960
31/108/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 237
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/07/1960
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 28/07/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 07/10/1961
30A Stratford w/e 09/12/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
41A Tinsley w/e 23/05/1970
31B March w/e 08/05/1971
SF Stratford w/e 12/01/1974
MR March 2w/e 12/10/1974
SF Stratford w/e 08/03/1975
FP Finsbury Park 3w/e 10/05/1975
91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 02/05/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 08/05/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
31/03/1970   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
02/06/1962 Not severe   Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    
10/10/1963 Not severe   Not known Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/07/1960 To Service To service as D5637
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 237
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
31/03/1970 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
23/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31213    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    

prev prev