Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15159 Week
» 68175 Month
» 187702 Year
» 3214555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5639 |
11/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31215 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/08/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
13/12/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5639 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 239 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
20/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31215 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
04/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31215 |
|
|
05/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|