Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1354 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14760 Week
» 67776 Month
» 187303 Year
» 3214156 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5640 |
18/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31407 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31507 |
30/04/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/08/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
24/09/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
16/04/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
16/04/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5640 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 240 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
16/04/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31407 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31507 |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31507 |
|
|
10/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|