Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5641 |
18/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31216 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31467 |
17/03/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/08/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
21/03/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
16/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Not known |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5641 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 241 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31216 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
17/03/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31467 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/03/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31467 |
|
|
08/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|