Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 6238 Month
» 314219 Year
» 1198600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5644 25/08/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31219 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/225/08/1960
31/112/03/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 244
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/08/1960
Withdrawn 18/02/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 06/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 25/08/1960
   Withdrawn 18/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
12/03/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
09/1968   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/08/1960 To Service To service as D5644
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 244
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
12/03/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31219    
18/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31219    
06/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev