Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5645 01/09/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31220 26/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/09/1960
31/103/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 245
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/09/1960
Withdrawn 01/03/1996
Time in Service 35 yrs , 6 mths
Cut Up 02/2002
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Old Oak Common MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 01/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 20/03/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
   Withdrawn 01/03/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/08/1973   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1960 To Service To service as D5645
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 245
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
11/08/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31220    
01/03/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31220    
02/2002 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD    

prev prev