Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 940 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14346 Week
» 67362 Month
» 186889 Year
» 3213742 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5645 |
01/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31220 |
26/01/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31441 |
02/05/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31541 |
30/04/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
01/09/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
21/07/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
21/07/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
0000 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5645 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 245 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
21/07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31220 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/05/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31441 |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31541 |
|
|
01/03/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31541 |
|
|
02/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD |
|
|