Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 388 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6197 Week
» 13381 Month
» 321362 Year
» 1205743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5647 01/09/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31221 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/09/1960
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 247
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/09/1960
Withdrawn 30/08/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 05/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 01/09/1960
31B March w/e 07/10/1972
34G Finsbury Park 2w/e 10/03/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 30/08/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1960 To Service To service as D5647
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 247
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31221    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
30/08/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31221    
05/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev