Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 195 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 8668 Month
» 236552 Year
» 1458117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5649 08/09/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 31223 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/208/09/1960
31/110/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 249
To Service 08/09/1960
Withdrawn 16/12/1991
Time in Service 31 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 06/1995
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 08/09/1960
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 16/12/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
10/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31      
05/1969   Dual Braked      

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
19/07/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
07/08/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/09/1960 To Service To service as D5649
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 249
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
10/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
05/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31223    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
16/12/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31223    
06/1995 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev