Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 870 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6679 Week
» 13863 Month
» 321844 Year
» 1206225 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5650 15/09/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31224 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/215/09/1960
31/111/12/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 250
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/09/1960
Withdrawn 30/06/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 11/2002
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34G Finsbury Park (New) 15/09/1960
30A Stratford w/e 17/05/1969
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn 30/06/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1968   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
12/03/1963 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1960 To Service To service as D5650
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 250
Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G)
   
04/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
17/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31224    
30/06/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31224    
11/2002 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev