Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1942 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15348 Week
» 68364 Month
» 187891 Year
» 3214744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5650 |
15/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31224 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
15/09/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/12/1965 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
04/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/03/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5650 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 250 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
11/12/1965 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31224 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
30/06/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31224 |
|
|
11/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|