Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5652 |
22/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31226 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
22/09/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
03/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/02/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5652 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 252 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31226 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
03/01/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31226 |
|
|
03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|