Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1175 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18978 Week
» 71994 Month
» 191521 Year
» 3218374 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5653 |
22/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31227 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
22/09/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
12/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
02/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/10/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 11/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
07/11/1963 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5653 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 253 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31227 |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
16/12/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31227 |
|
|
01/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|