Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5655 29/09/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31229 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/229/09/1960
31/126/10/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 255
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/09/1960
Withdrawn 10/08/2001
Time in Service 40 yrs, 10 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 08/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 29/09/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 25/11/1961
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
40B Immingham w/e 15/04/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 29/03/1969
40B Immingham w/e 07/06/1969
81A Old Oak Common w/e 08/01/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 06/10/1973
OC Old Oak Common 2w/e 08/03/1975
BR Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/11/1975
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 10/08/2001

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
26/10/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
23/09/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1960 To Service To service as D5655
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 255
Allocated to March (31B)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
26/10/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/01/1972 Sightings Locomotives on shed at Old Oak Common: Locomotive on shed at Old Oak Common RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31229    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
08/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
08/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    
10/08/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 31229    

prev prev