Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 219 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4856 Week
» 16149 Month
» 280782 Year
» 1502347 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5656 06/10/1960  
TOPS (31/4) 31409 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/206/10/1960
31/107/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 256
To Service 06/10/1960 to March (31B)
Withdrawn 04/01/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 03/1992
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) on 06/10/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 25/11/1961
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 23/02/1963
31B March w/e 14/09/1963
40B Immingham w/e 15/04/1967
31B March w/e 10/08/1968
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
34G Finsbury Park w/e 11/12/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 24/06/1972
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn on 04/01/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
07/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31      
12/1971   Dual AWS Fitted      
11/12/1971   Dual Braked      

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
09/12/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1960 To Service To service as D5656
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 256
Allocated to March (31B)
   
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/1971 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
11/12/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/12/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
24/06/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31409    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
04/01/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31409    
03/1992 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev