Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5657 06/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31230 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/206/10/1960
31/123/11/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 257
Cost when Built £
To Service 06/10/1960
Cut Up 03/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 06/10/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 09/12/1961
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 23/02/1963
31B March w/e 14/09/1963
40B Immingham w/e 15/04/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
40B Immingham w/e 24/02/1968
31B March w/e 10/08/1968
30A Stratford w/e 31/01/1970
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/05/1971
41A Tinsley w/e 11/11/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 08/03/1975
91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 08/03/1975
OC Old Oak Common w/e 12/04/1975
BS Bescot w/e 15/05/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1968   Dual Braked  
23/11/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1960 To Service To service as D5657
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 257
Allocated to March (31B)
   
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
24/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
23/11/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
31/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31230    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/04/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (BS)    
03/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev