Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 80 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 5227 Week
» 15397 Month
» 293193 Year
» 1177574 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5658 13/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31231 07/12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/213/10/1960
31/111/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 258
Cost when Built £
To Service 13/10/1960
Withdrawn 22/01/1990
Time in Service 29 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 03/1991
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 13/10/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 23/02/1963
31B March w/e 14/09/1963
40B Immingham w/e 15/04/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/05/1971
91M To London Midland Region w/e 18/03/1972
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 18/03/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 25/03/1972
91E To Eastern Region w/e 25/03/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 11/11/1972
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 08/03/1975
91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 08/03/1975
OC Old Oak Common w/e 12/04/1975
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
IM Immingham 28/08/1988
   Withdrawn 22/01/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/10/1960 To Service To service as D5658
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 258
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
18/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
18/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
25/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
25/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31231    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/04/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
28/08/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
22/01/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 31231    
03/1991 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev