Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 231 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4399 Week
» 19513 Month
» 322703 Year
» 1544268 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5659 20/10/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 31232 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/220/10/1960
31/109/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 259
To Service 20/10/1960 to March (31B)
Withdrawn 26/05/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 08/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) on 20/10/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
31B March w/e 27/04/1963
   w/e 07/08/1965
31B March w/e 18/12/1965
30A Stratford w/e 25/05/1968
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 06/05/1972
55B York (North) w/e 24/06/1972
40B Immingham w/e 11/11/1972
   Withdrawn on 26/05/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31        
10/1971   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1960 To Service To service as D5659
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 259
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Research Department (Derby) (92D)    
18/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
25/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
24/06/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31232    
26/05/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31232    
08/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev