Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5660 20/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31233 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/220/10/1960
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 260
Cost when Built £
To Service 20/10/1960
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 20/10/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
31B March w/e 22/06/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 17/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 19/06/1965
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 25/01/1969
MR March w/e 12/01/1974
IM Immingham w/e 23/05/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1960 To Service To service as D5660
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 260
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31233    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
23/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    

prev prev