Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5661 27/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31234 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/227/10/1960
31/112/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 261
Cost when Built £
To Service 27/10/1960
Withdrawn 11/06/1993
Time in Service 32 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 05/1994
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 27/10/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 24/07/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
30A Stratford w/e 09/05/1970
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
FP Finsbury Park w/e 23/05/1976
   Withdrawn 11/06/1993

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
12/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
03/10/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/10/1960 To Service To service as D5661
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 261
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31234    
23/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
11/06/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 31234    
05/1994 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev