Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1451 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14857 Week
» 67873 Month
» 187400 Year
» 3214253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5663 |
03/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31236 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31433 |
03/02/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31533 |
31/12/1989 |
|
TOPS (31/4 (2)) |
31433 |
01/02/2002 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/11/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
15/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5663 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 263 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
11/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31236 |
|
|
03/02/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31433 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
31/12/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31533 |
|
|
01/07/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31533 |
|
|
01/02/2002 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31433 |
|
|
09/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|