Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5663 03/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31236 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/11/1960
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 263
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/11/1960
Withdrawn 01/07/1995
Time in Service 34 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 09/2006
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 03/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
31B March w/e 27/04/1963
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1965
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/04/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 17/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 19/06/1965
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/10/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
30A Stratford w/e 09/05/1970
31B March w/e 10/10/1970
   Withdrawn 01/07/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
15/08/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/11/1960 To Service To service as D5663
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 263
Allocated to March (31B)
   
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
16/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/05/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31236    
01/07/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31236    
09/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev