Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5665 10/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31238 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/11/1960
31/112/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 265
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/11/1960
Withdrawn 14/01/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 06/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 10/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
34G Finsbury Park w/e 10/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
31B March w/e 22/01/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 21/10/1972
31B March w/e 16/12/1972
IM Immingham w/e 12/01/1974
   Withdrawn 14/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
06/1969   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1960 To Service To service as D5665
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 265
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
06/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
16/12/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31238    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
06/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    
14/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31238    

prev prev