Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18105 Week
» 71121 Month
» 190648 Year
» 3217501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5666 |
10/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31239 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31439 |
06/04/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
10/11/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5666 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 266 Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
10/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31239 |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/04/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31439 |
|
|