Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 684 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7836 Week
» 27481 Month
» 62123 Year
» 1283688 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5666 10/11/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31239 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/11/1960
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Works Number 266
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/11/1960
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 10/11/1960
30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 14/08/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
91M To London Midland Region 2w/e 08/04/1972
D16 Nottingham Division 2w/e 08/04/1972
31B March w/e 15/04/1972

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    
10/11/1960 To Service To service as D5666
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 266
Allocated to March (31B)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
08/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
15/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31239    

prev prev